06/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 285 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1041 |
|
|
1908 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: ?/12/1908. |
|
|
1912 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: ?/07/1912. |
|
|
1916 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: ?/08/1916. |
|
|
1918 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1918. Dep: ?/03/1918. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
08/05/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1922. Dep: 25/07/1922. |
|
|
09/01/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/01/1924. Dep: 17/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3285
|
|
|
27/08/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/08/1924. Dep: 06/09/1924. |
|
|
13/10/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/10/1924. Dep: 14/02/1925. |
|
|
06/08/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1926. Dep: 14/12/1926. |
|
|
13/06/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1928. Dep: 01/09/1928. |
|
|
19/07/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1930. Dep: 20/09/1930. |
|
|
04/02/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1933. Dep: 18/03/1933. |
|
|
16/06/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1934. Dep: 18/08/1934. |
|
|
09/05/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1936. Dep: 13/06/1936. |
|
|
11/06/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1938. Dep: 09/07/1938. |
|
|
19/07/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1941. Dep: 06/09/1941. |
|
|
22/01/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1944. Dep: 19/02/1944. |
|
|
09/03/1944 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2814 but not taken up |
|
|
14/04/1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 14/04/1946. Dep: 14/04/1946. |
|
|
02/05/1946 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3285 |
|
|