06/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1404 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1081 |
|
|
1910 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: ?/04/1910. |
|
|
1914 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: ?/03/1914. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
1920 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: ?/02/1920. |
|
|
10/08/1921 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1921. Dep: 26/11/1921. |
|
|
09/01/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1923. Dep: 31/03/1923. |
|
|
02/05/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1924. Dep: 19/07/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4404
|
|
|
03/08/1924 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
15/04/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1926. Dep: 21/09/1926. |
|
|
06/07/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1928. Dep: 20/09/1928. |
|
|
20/09/1928 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
08/11/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1930. Dep: 27/12/1930. |
|
|
28/01/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1933. Dep: 11/03/1933. |
|
|
09/03/1933 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
08/12/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1934. Dep: 12/01/1935. |
|
|
05/12/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1936. Dep: 09/01/1937. |
|
|
06/05/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1939. Dep: 01/07/1939. |
|
|
20/09/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1941. Dep: 18/10/1941. |
|
|
09/10/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1943. Dep: 27/11/1943. |
|
|
25/03/1944 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
26/03/1944 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) |
|
|
06/01/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/01/1945. Dep: 03/02/1945. |
|
|
07/04/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/04/1945. Dep: 28/04/1945. |
|
|
14/09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2834 |
|
|
05/01/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
08/08/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2834 |
|
|