04/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1423 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1146 |
|
|
1913 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: 07/01/1913. |
|
|
1919 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: ?/08/1919. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
08/05/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1922. Dep: 03/08/1922. |
|
|
23/06/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1924. Dep: 24/10/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4423
|
|
|
10/11/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/11/1924. Dep: 31/12/1924. |
|
|
07/08/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/08/1925. Dep: 05/09/1925. |
|
|
02/03/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1926. Dep: 19/06/1926. |
|
|
27/02/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1928. Dep: 07/06/1928. |
|
|
19/04/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1930. Dep: 07/06/1930. |
|
|
02/07/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1932. Dep: 20/08/1932. |
|
|
20/09/1932 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) |
|
|
05/05/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1934. Dep: 16/06/1934. |
|
|
20/06/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1936. Dep: 01/08/1936. |
|
|
03/10/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/10/1936. Dep: 17/10/1936. |
|
|
14/11/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/11/1936. Dep: 05/12/1936. |
|
|
04/12/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
08/10/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1938. Dep: 05/11/1938. |
|
|
16/11/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1940. Dep: 21/12/1940. |
|
|
03/01/1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1942. Dep: 21/02/1942. |
|
|
04/09/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1943. Dep: 02/10/1943. |
|
|
09/06/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1945. Dep: 28/07/1945. |
|
|
17/11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2853 |
|
|
25/04/1947 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 25/04/1947. Dep: 25/04/1947. |
|
|
27/05/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2853 |
|
|