Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2263 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20066 Week
» 73082 Month
» 192609 Year
» 3219462 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1429 |
|
05/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4429 |
|
05/07/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2859 |
|
26/10/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
249 |
Works Number |
1152 |
To Service |
During 05/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 08/08/1947 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/08/1947 |
Hitchin MPD |
A number of withdrawn locos. are still lying at various sheds awaiting removal to Works for cutting up; amongst those recently seen were: at Hitchin, 'Cl' 2801/41/59 and 'J3' 4138. |
SLS/194710 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1429 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1152 |
|
|
1919 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: ?/05/1919. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
11/10/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 11/10/1922. Dep: 23/12/1922. |
|
|
06/05/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1924. Dep: 05/07/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4429
|
|
|
28/04/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1926. Dep: 07/10/1926. |
|
|
27/06/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1928. Dep: 03/10/1928. |
|
|
15/11/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/11/1928. Dep: 28/12/1928. |
|
|
06/09/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1930. Dep: 08/11/1930. |
|
|
28/05/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1932. Dep: 09/07/1932. |
|
|
13/01/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1934. Dep: 10/02/1934. |
|
|
02/02/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1935. Dep: 02/03/1935. |
|
|
10/10/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1936. Dep: 07/11/1936. |
|
|
23/07/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1938. Dep: 20/08/1938. |
|
|
13/07/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1940. Dep: 24/08/1940. |
|
|
07/06/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/06/1941. Dep: 14/06/1941. |
|
|
16/05/1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1942. Dep: 11/07/1942. |
|
|
22/03/1944 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
26/03/1944 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) |
|
|
29/04/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1944. Dep: 27/05/1944. |
|
|
26/10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2859 |
|
|
05/01/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
08/08/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2859 |
|
|