11/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1434 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1173 |
|
|
1912 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: ?/11/1912. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
1919 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: ?/10/1919. |
|
|
11/12/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1922. Dep: 28/03/1923. |
|
|
06/1923 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) |
|
|
12/05/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/05/1924. Dep: 17/05/1924. |
|
|
07/01/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1925. Dep: 09/05/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4434
|
|
|
17/12/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1926. Dep: 26/03/1927. |
|
|
16/02/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1929. Dep: 13/04/1929. |
|
|
31/12/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1930. Dep: 14/02/1931. |
|
|
14/01/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1933. Dep: 25/02/1933. |
|
|
30/09/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1933. Dep: 11/11/1933. |
|
|
08/06/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1935. Dep: 20/07/1935. |
|
|
14/11/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1936. Dep: 12/12/1936. |
|
|
08/03/1937 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) |
|
|
27/11/1937 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/11/1937. Dep: 31/12/1937. |
|
|
02/01/1938 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
07/08/1938 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) |
|
|
02/12/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1939. Dep: 13/01/1940. |
|
|
03/05/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1941. Dep: 28/06/1941. |
|
|
14/04/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1944. Dep: 12/05/1944. |
|
|
14/04/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 14/04/1945. Dep: 14/04/1945. |
|
|
26/04/1945 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4434 |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2864 but not taken up |
|
|