|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1914 | 05/1914 | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Doncaster Works | 1921 | 06/1921 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1922 | 25/03/1922 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/05/1923 | 14/07/1923 | 71 days | General | Cut down for NBR loading gauge |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/09/1925 | 18/12/1925 | 96 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4447 |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1927 | 03/02/1928 | 79 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1930 | 12/04/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/06/1933 | 05/08/1933 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/06/1934 | 28/07/1934 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1936 | 22/08/1936 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1938 | 25/06/1938 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1941 | 15/02/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/08/1941 | 01/11/1941 | 64 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/09/1943 | 25/09/1943 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1945 | 23/06/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/02/1946 | 23/02/1946 | 22 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1948 | 10/03/1948 | 39 days | General | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E2877 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1948 | Doncaster Works | Nos. 22, 23, 27, 34, 79, 91, 103, 504, 511/2/4 were all in Doncaster Plant about the beginning of March, but not all were in for general repair. Owing to a defective cylinder and piston, 'C.1' No. 2808 has been condemned, the boiler of which has now been placed on No. 2877. New 'A.2' No. 60532 Blue Peter was ready towards the end of March. The first re-numbered engines (green) ex Doncaster were: Nos. 60079, 60066 (after Goswick crash), 60512, 61070 an 60982, while others in hand included Nos. 60007/23 an 61828. No. 60534 will soon be ready, completing E.O. 380. Order 381 is for five 'A.2' following on. It is understood Orders 382-3 will be for 16 new 'A.1' 4-6-2's. | SLS/194805 |
31/08/1950 | General | Several Doncaster V.2 were on Leicester turns in August. Class 4 2-6-0 No. 43051, built Doncaster, has been noted on South Yorkshire turns. The 'C.1' E2877 (G.N.1447) was outside Doncaster Works on 16th July. B.17 4-6-0 are used extensively on the Clacton-Liverpool Street hourly buffet-car expresses. | SLS/195010 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1908 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1447 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1196 |
||
1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: ?/05/1914. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: ?/06/1921. | ||
22/02/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/02/1922. Dep: 25/03/1922. | ||
10/03/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
05/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1923. Dep: 14/07/1923. Work undertaken: Cut down for NBR loading gauge |
||
12/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
14/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1925. Dep: 18/12/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4447 |
||
17/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1927. Dep: 03/02/1928. | ||
01/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1930. Dep: 12/04/1930. | ||
24/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1933. Dep: 05/08/1933. | ||
16/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1934. Dep: 28/07/1934. | ||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
17/06/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
11/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1936. Dep: 22/08/1936. | ||
29/08/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
28/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1938. Dep: 25/06/1938. | ||
11/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1941. Dep: 15/02/1941. | ||
30/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1941. Dep: 01/11/1941. | ||
01/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
04/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1943. Dep: 25/09/1943. | ||
09/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/06/1945. Dep: 23/06/1945. | ||
02/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 02/02/1946. Dep: 23/02/1946. | ||
21/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2877 | ||
01/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1948. Dep: 10/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E2877 |
||
09/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
07/11/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2877 |