Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 952 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 952 Week
» 19853 Month
» 19853 Year
» 1685229 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 192 m/e 12/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5192 m/e 10/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2900 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 62900 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
C4/212/1903
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9034
Works Number 4539
To Service During 12/1903
Withdrawal Thu 09/11/1950
Scrapping During 11/1950
Service Life 46 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1903
BOS Boston on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 09/11/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln on 07/09/1947
ALLOC BOS Boston on 14/09/1947
WDN   on 09/11/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1903 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 192
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4539
   
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5192    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2900    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Boston (BOS)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 62900 but not taken up    
09/11/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 2900    

prev