Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 978 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 978 Week
» 19879 Month
» 19879 Year
» 1685255 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 194 m/e 12/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5194 m/e 10/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2901 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 62901 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
C4/212/1903
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9034
Works Number 4540
To Service During 12/1903
Withdrawal Tue 28/11/1950
Scrapping During 12/1950
Service Life 46 yrs, 11 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1903
BOS Boston on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 28/11/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln on 21/09/1947
ALLOC BOS Boston w/e 01/11/1947
WDN   on 28/11/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1903 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 194
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4540
   
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5194    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2901    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Boston (BOS)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 62901 but not taken up    
28/11/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 2901    

prev prev