Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 196 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2465 Week
» 21366 Month
» 21366 Year
» 1686742 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 263 m/e 07/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5263 m/e 04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2902 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 62902 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
C4/207/1904
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9233
Works Number 4597
To Service During 07/1904
Withdrawal Fri 01/04/1949
Scrapping During 05/1949
Service Life 44 yrs, 9 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1904
IMM Immingham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 01/04/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham on 27/04/1947
ALLOC LIN Lincoln on 14/07/1947
ALLOC IMM Immingham w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC BOS Boston w/e 02/10/1948
WDN BOS Boston on 30/04/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 263
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4597
   
04/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5263    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2902    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 62902 but not taken up    
01/04/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 2902    

prev prev