Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 73 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3491 Week
» 28325 Month
» 62657 Year
» 1728033 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 264 m/e 07/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5264 m/e 02/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2903 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 62903 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
C4/207/1904
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9233
Works Number 4598
To Service During 07/1904
Withdrawal Wed 15/06/1949
Service Life 44 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1949

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1904
IMM   Immingham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
LIN   Lincoln w/e 02/10/1948
     Withdrawn on 15/06/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln on 19/01/1947
ALLOC IMM Immingham w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC LIN Lincoln w/e 02/10/1948
WDN LIN Lincoln on 15/06/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 264
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4598
   
02/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5264    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2903    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
02/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 62903 but not taken up    
06/1949 Scrapped Scrapped    
15/06/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 2903    

prev prev