Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 41 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4760 Week
» 15905 Month
» 115690 Year
» 1781066 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 265 m/e 07/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5265 m/e 01/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2904 m/e 08/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
C4/207/1904
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9233
Works Number 4599
To Service During 07/1904
Withdrawal During 12/1947
Service Life 43 yrs , 5 mths

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1904
     Withdrawn m/e 12/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC IMM Immingham on 08/12/1946
ALLOC LIN Lincoln on 14/07/1947
ALLOC IMM Immingham w/e 29/11/1947
WDN IMM Immingham on 16/12/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 265
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4599
   
01/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5265    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2904    
12/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 2904    

prev prev