Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 926 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 926 Week
» 19827 Month
» 19827 Year
» 1685203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 267 m/e 07/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5267 m/e 02/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2906 on 24/03/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
C4/207/1904
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9233
Works Number 4601
To Service During 07/1904
Withdrawal During 11/1947
Service Life 43 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1904
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln on 07/09/1947
ALLOC BOS Boston on 14/09/1947
WDN BOS Boston on 20/11/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 267
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4601
   
02/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5267    
24/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2906    
11/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 2906    

prev prev