Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 645 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7328 Week
» 18374 Month
» 18374 Year
» 1683750 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1092 m/e 11/1905
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6092 m/e 07/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2915 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 62915 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
C4/211/1905
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L130
Works Number 16942
To Service During 11/1905
Withdrawal Wed 08/06/1949
Scrapping During 06/1949
Service Life 43 yrs, 7 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1905
LIN Lincoln on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 08/06/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln on 14/09/1947
ALLOC BOS Boston w/e 02/10/1948
WDN BOS Boston on 08/06/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1905 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1092
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 16942
   
07/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6092    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2915    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lincoln (LIN)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 62915 but not taken up    
08/06/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 2915    

prev prev