Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 945 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 5437 Week
» 30271 Month
» 64603 Year
» 1729979 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 261 m/e 03/1906
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5261 m/e 11/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2919 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 62919 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
C4/203/1906
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 03/1906
Withdrawal Wed 22/11/1950
Service Life 44 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1950

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1906
BOS   Boston on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
IMM   Immingham w/e 02/10/1948
     Withdrawn on 22/11/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln on 07/09/1947
ALLOC BOS Boston on 14/09/1947
ALLOC IMM Immingham w/e 02/10/1948
WDN   on 22/11/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1906 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 261
Built at Gorton Works
   
11/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5261    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2919    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Boston (BOS)    
02/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 62919 but not taken up    
11/1950 Scrapped Scrapped    
22/11/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 2919    

prev prev