Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 953 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 953 Week
» 19854 Month
» 19854 Year
» 1685230 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 262 m/e 04/1906
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5262 m/e 04/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2920 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 62920 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
C4/204/1906
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 04/1906
Withdrawal Tue 03/02/1948
Scrapping Sat 28/02/1948
Service Life 41 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1906
BOS Boston on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 03/02/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln on 14/09/1947
ALLOC BOS Boston w/e 01/11/1947
WDN BOS Boston on 03/02/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1906 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 262
Built at Gorton Works
   
04/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5262    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2920    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Boston (BOS)    
03/02/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 2920    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 62920 but not taken up    

prev prev