Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1001 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 1001 Week
» 19902 Month
» 19902 Year
» 1685278 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 360 m/e 06/1906
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5360 m/e 07/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2922 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 62922 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
C4/206/1906
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 06/1906
Withdrawal Wed 23/06/1948
Scrapping During 06/1948
Service Life 42 yrs , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1906
BOS Boston on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 23/06/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham on 02/05/1947
ALLOC LIN Lincoln on 14/07/1947
ALLOC BOS Boston w/e 01/11/1947
WDN BOS Boston on 23/06/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1906 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 360
Built at Gorton Works
   
07/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5360    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2922    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Boston (BOS)    
23/06/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 2922    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 62922 but not taken up    

prev prev