Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 245 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2410 Week
» 2410 Month
» 69272 Year
» 1734648 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 362 m/e 06/1906
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5362 m/e 05/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2924 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 62924 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
C4/206/1906
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 06/1906
Withdrawal Fri 30/01/1948
Service Life 41 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 28/02/1948

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1906
BOS   Boston on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 30/01/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln on 21/09/1947
ALLOC BOS Boston w/e 01/11/1947
WDN BOS Boston on 30/01/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1906 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 362
Built at Gorton Works
   
05/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5362    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2924    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Boston (BOS)    
30/01/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 2924    
28/02/1948 Scrapped Scrapped    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 62924 but not taken up    

prev prev