Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3978 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22889 Week
» 87843 Month
» 290507 Year
» 3317360 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
363 |
m/e |
08/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5363 |
m/e |
03/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2925 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
62925 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
C4 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 08/1906 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 14/04/1949 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 8 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1906 |
BOS |
|
Boston |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/04/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
IMM |
Immingham |
on |
30/04/1947 |
ALLOC |
LIN |
Lincoln |
on |
14/07/1947 |
ALLOC |
BOS |
Boston |
w/e |
01/11/1947 |
WDN |
BOS |
Boston |
on |
14/04/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 363 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
03/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5363 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2925 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Boston (BOS) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 62925 but not taken up |
|
|
04/1949 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
14/04/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2925 |
|
|