Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 265 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2534 Week
» 21435 Month
» 21435 Year
» 1686811 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 365   12/1906
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5365   05/09/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2898   01/09/1946

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1907 SIR WILLIAM POLLITT

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 12/1906
Withdrawal Mon 25/08/1947
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 40 yrs, 8 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1906
LEI Leicester (G.C.) on 17/09/1920
IMM Immingham on 17/05/1933
   Withdrawn on 25/08/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN IMM Immingham on 25/08/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1906 Diagram 15 boiler fitted


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 28/01/1911 20/05/1911 113 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
 
Gorton Works 16/08/1919 20/03/1920 218 days General  
Gorton Works 03/03/1923 26/05/1923 85 days General  
Gorton Works 07/03/1925 05/09/1925 183 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5365
 
Gorton Works 06/08/1927 22/10/1927 78 days General  
Gorton Works 09/06/1928 23/06/1928 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 30/11/1929 11/01/1930 43 days General  
Gorton Works 24/10/1931 05/12/1931 43 days General  
Gorton Works 10/02/1934 10/03/1934 29 days General  
Gorton Works 19/09/1936 28/11/1936 71 days General  
Gorton Works 01/01/1938 26/02/1938 57 days General  
Gorton Works 27/01/1940 24/02/1940 29 days General  
Gorton Works 29/03/1941 14/06/1941 78 days General  
Gorton Works 18/06/1942 29/08/1942 73 days General  
Gorton Works 12/09/1944 07/10/1944 26 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1906 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 365
Built at Gorton Works
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
10/1907 Naming Named 'SIR WILLIAM POLLITT'    
17/09/1920 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)    
17/05/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2898    
25/08/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 2898    

prev