Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1076 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18879 Week
» 71895 Month
» 191422 Year
» 3218275 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1508 |
m/e |
05/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4508 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7366 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
67366 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C12 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
212 |
Works Number |
819 |
To Service |
During 05/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 03/04/1958 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1922 |
Condensers removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1950 |
Doncaster Works |
Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. |
SLS/195006 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1508 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 819 |
|
|
04/1922 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
10/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4508 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7366 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Chester Northgate (CHR) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67366 |
|
|
17/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
04/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
03/04/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67366 |
|
|