Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2569 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15975 Week
» 68991 Month
» 188518 Year
» 3215371 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1528 |
m/e |
11/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4528 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7381 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
67381 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C12 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
223 |
Works Number |
931 |
To Service |
During 11/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 21/01/1952 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1952 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1901 |
LIN |
|
Lincoln |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/01/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LOU |
|
w/e |
26/10/1946 |
ALLOC |
LIN |
Lincoln |
on |
19/01/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
21/01/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1922 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1528 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 931 |
|
|
05/1922 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
08/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4528 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7381 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67381 |
|
|
01/1952 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
21/01/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67381 |
|
|