Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 29 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17832 Week
» 70848 Month
» 190375 Year
» 3217228 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1530 |
m/e |
11/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4530 |
m/e |
09/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7383 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
67383 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C12 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
223 |
Works Number |
933 |
To Service |
During 11/1901 |
Withdrawal |
During 01/1955 |
Service Life |
53 yrs , 2 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BOS |
Boston |
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
LIN |
Lincoln |
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
ALLOC |
40C |
Louth |
w/e |
27/08/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/02/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1923 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1530 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 933 |
|
|
12/1923 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
09/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4530 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7383 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) |
|
|
26/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (BOS) |
|
|
05/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67383 |
|
|
27/08/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Louth (40C) |
|
|
23/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Louth (40C) |
|
|
01/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67383 |
|
|
01/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|