Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 994 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 2166 Week
» 21067 Month
» 21067 Year
» 1686443 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1055 m/e 03/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6055 m/e 02/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7400 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 67400 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C13
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 1874
To Service During 03/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/12/1956
Scrapping During 01/1957
Service Life 53 yrs, 9 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1903
CHRN Chester Northgate on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 05/11/1955
   Withdrawn w/e 22/12/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CHR Chester West on 27/03/1947
LOAN 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 25/02/1956
WDN   w/e 22/12/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1926 Superheated boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1943 Cambridge Area Notes (By The Cambridge University Railway Club) Interest in the Cambridge area continues to centre upon the procession of locomotives to and from Stratford works. These usually spend some time on the dead road at Cambridge shed before proceeding on their journey; luckily they are then easily visible from the public highway. Only one 'O4' has been so reported recently-6502, which passed through on 31/8, newly repainted. This seems rather a roundabout way to return to Woodford-may the practice continue!
There has been a recent tendency for 'E4's' and 'J15's' to be returned to Norwich via Cambridge; and 7791, 7497, 7516 & 7825 have been seen. Nos. 7360(LIN), 7323(NWE) and 7400(FRO) have been noted returning from Stratford-the former stayed in Cambridge for about three weeks. 7340(BSE) (Bury) has also been to Cambridge and worked in the yard for about a month, presumably on loan, as 7011 & 7190 have gone to Stratford for repair; and the stud of shunting tanks has been further depleted by the loan of 7256 to KL.
No. 2095 was in Cambridge yards on 21/9 presumably returning to Darlington. Nos. 4355, 3400, 089 an 092 have recently been in Cambridge for repairs, whilst 065 was in the yard on 18/9 and probably has gone to Stratford. Light repairs to South Lynn engines are often performed in Cambridge-usually at the back of the running shed unless the lift shop gear is required. This practice results in little check being possible on the rarest of our visitors!
Nos. 8883/7/99 have returned from Stratford rebuilt as class D16/3; 8896 returned not so rebuilt. 8899 is the first of the 8890 series to be rebuilt. 8887 has been transferred from KL to CAM on rebuilding. A number of 'D15's' can be seen still-8867(COL) is almost a daily visitor, and spent some time recently in the lift shops; 8881/90/3/5/6(KL) of King's Lynn often appear; 8892/7(BSE) of Bury appear on most days whilst 7764 is stationed at Cambridge.
The large stud of Passenger locomotives attached results in a certain dullness of workings. Duties on the Liverpool St. line are split between Cambridge and Stratford; there is one regular Colchester working via Haverhill and also one from Ipswich and King's Lynn and two from Bury. Certain other trains, especially those from March via St. Ives, are often powered from March or King's Lynn sheds. Norwich locomotives appear irregularly-most frequently 'Sandringhams,' which appear sometimes on Stratford turns.
Recently a certain amount of variety has crept into the Liverpool St. workings as 'K3's' and 'K2's' have appeared fairly frequently. On 23/8/43 Nos. 4647, 2459 an 163 appeared on successive trains. On 19/9 the first part of the 2.20 p.m. ex Liverpool St. came in behind 2816(IPS) and the second behind 4631 (NOR).
The majority of trains on the King's Cross line continue to be hauled by 'C1' Atlantics. There are three turns on which Pacifics and 'V2's' appear fairly regularly-almost invariably King's Cross locomotives. There is a certain amount of variety with the 'Atlantics'; though those from sheds North of Peterborough are very rare. Two trains are usually hauled by Cambridge locos. almost always 'B17's' or 'Clauds.' Recently 2844(NOR) worked one of these, and must have been a very rare visitor at King's Cross. The turntable at Cambridge is now under repair and, as a result, the big engines do not work in as they cannot be turned on the LMS table. Cambridge 'Claud' workings compensate for the increase in strain on the GN sheds.
March is, of course, the main source of Goods locos. and its 'O2's' and 0-6-0's are abundant. Since the arrival of the American locomotives, the 'K3's' have become less common though the K2's' the more so. On a recent afternoon there were four types of 2-8-0 in the yard-'02'; USA; 'Austerity' (one from LNE and one from LMS); and a standard LMS freight built by SR. Later one of the Vulcan-built 'Austerities' came in (the other 2 were by N.B. Loco), followed by an 'O4.'
The LNW trains, as ever, specialise in bringing us Bletchley 'Princes,' 2-6-4T and 0-8-0. There is one regular 2D turn per day. Occasionally standard 0-6-0's (usually from the Midland division) appear and also standard 2-8-0's from 1A. Recently 4-4-0 420 (2A) appeared on a passenger train; another recent visitor has been Compound No. 900. On the Midland trains, Kettering supplies a variety of 2F 0-6-0's which, together with 2-4-0 No. 20216, appear to be well suited to this type of work on local passenger trains.
SLS/194401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1903 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1055
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 1874
   
02/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6055    
03/1926 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7400    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Chester Northgate (CHRN)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67400    
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E)    
22/12/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 67400    

prev