Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 469 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2634 Week
» 2634 Month
» 69496 Year
» 1734872 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 179 m/e 06/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5179 m/e 08/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7414 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 67414 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C13
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 06/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/06/1955
Service Life 52 yrs , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1955

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1903
CHRN   Chester Northgate on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
6E   Wrexham Rhosddu 8w/e 19/06/1954
     Withdrawn w/e 11/06/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CHR Chester West on 05/12/1946
ALLOC 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 12/06/1954
WDN   w/e 11/06/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1929 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1903 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 179
Built at Gorton Works
   
08/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5179    
05/1929 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7414    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Chester Northgate (CHRN)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67414    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E)    
06/1955 Scrapped Scrapped    
11/06/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67414    

prev prev