Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 201 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2470 Week
» 21371 Month
» 21371 Year
» 1686747 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 190 m/e 08/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5190 m/e 02/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7416 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 67416 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C13
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 08/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/12/1958
Scrapping During 02/1959
Service Life 55 yrs, 4 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1903
GOR Gorton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
34A Kings Cross 4w/e 25/11/1950
34E Neasden 5w/e 24/03/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 27/12/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 34E Neasden m/e 31/03/1951
LOAN 14D Neasden on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 27/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1929 Superheated boiler fitted
08/1933 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1942 L.N.E.R. Notes (March Area) March Area.-'V.2's' appear quite often, the following having been noted in Oct./Nov.: 4772/96, 4813/7. 'J.17' 8195 has been fitted with carriage heating and vacuum brake. 2859 East Anglian was here 31/10/42 fresh from Plant. It has ordinary whistle. A 'Pacific' visits us regularly on Sundays, examples noted being 4472/4 an 2571. 'E.4's' 7408/16/66/92 an 7503 are stationed here for working on the Joint line to Spalding, &c.-the first ones shedded here for a long time. Our regular station pilot 8062 is often in shops and its place is taken by 'D.16' 8805 or by 'D.9' or 'J.15' classes. SLS/194302
27/12/1958 Chesham Branch Following the withdrawal of Neasden's last GC 4-4-2T, 67416, the Chesham branch. is being worked by Ivatt 2-6-2Ts made redundant at Bedford-41270/2, 41329. 67416/8/20 had been engaged exclusively on this branch which is worked by push/pull sets. SLS/195902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1903 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 190
Built at Gorton Works
   
02/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5190    
04/1929 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7416    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gorton (GOR)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67416    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (34E)    
27/12/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67416    

prev prev