Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 232 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2501 Week
» 21402 Month
» 21402 Year
» 1686778 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 199 m/e 09/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5199 m/e 02/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7419 m/e 04/1946
British Railways 67419 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C13
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 09/1903
Withdrawal Mon 10/06/1957
Scrapping During 07/1957
Service Life 53 yrs, 9 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1903
GOR Gorton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
39A Gorton 4w/e 17/11/1956
   Withdrawn on 10/06/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 10/11/1956
WDN   on 10/06/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1930 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1903 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 199
Built at Gorton Works
   
02/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 5199    
10/1930 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7419    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gorton (GOR)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67419    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
10/06/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 67419    

prev prev