Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 309 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5920 Week
» 16966 Month
» 16966 Year
» 1682342 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 2 m/e 08/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5002 m/e 08/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7420 on 23/03/1946
British Railways 67420 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C13
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 08/1904
Withdrawal w/e Sat 13/12/1958
Scrapping During 02/1959
Service Life 54 yrs, 4 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1904
NEA Neasden on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn w/e 13/12/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 14D Neasden on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 13/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1930 Superheated boiler fitted
07/1941 Push and Pull Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 2
Built at Gorton Works
   
08/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5002    
05/1930 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
23/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7420    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Neasden (NEA)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67420    
13/12/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67420    

prev prev