Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 883 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6379 Week
» 25280 Month
» 25280 Year
» 1690656 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 20 m/e 10/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5020 m/e 05/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7423 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 67423 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C13
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 10/1904
Withdrawal Mon 14/10/1957
Scrapping During 12/1957
Service Life 53 yrs , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1904
GOR Gorton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
36D Barnsley 5w/e 19/01/1957
   Withdrawn on 14/10/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36D Barnsley 4w/e 29/12/1956
WDN   on 14/10/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1934 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 20
Built at Gorton Works
   
05/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5020    
09/1934 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7423    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gorton (GOR)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67423    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
14/10/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 67423    

prev prev