Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 220 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2489 Week
» 21390 Month
» 21390 Year
» 1686766 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 27 m/e 10/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5027 m/e 07/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7424 on 17/03/1946
British Railways 67424 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C13
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 10/1904
Withdrawal Fri 14/11/1958
Scrapping During 02/1959
Service Life 54 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1904
GOR Gorton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 18/04/1953
   Withdrawn on 14/11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 18/04/1953
WDN   on 14/11/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1930 Superheated boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/10/1948 Darlington Works The first new 'A.1,' No. 60130, was on trial W/E 24/9 and No. 60131 during W/E 2/10, both are nameless. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 517, 2342/71, 3344, 5027/28, 5852/83, 7300/07, 8141, E8723, 9392, 9881, 61638, 63099, 69841 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60804, 60980, 62729/75, 63333/91, 65666/92, 65752, 68302/99, 68675, 68744, 69868 and 'Austerity' 77050. No. 9089 was broken up W/E 24/9. SLS/194811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 27
Built at Gorton Works
   
07/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5027    
03/1930 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
17/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7424    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gorton (GOR)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67424    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
14/11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67424    

prev prev