Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 914 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6525 Week
» 17571 Month
» 17571 Year
» 1682947 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 29 m/e 12/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5029 m/e 04/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7427 on 17/03/1946
British Railways 67427 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C13
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 12/1904
Withdrawal Mon 06/01/1958
Scrapping During 02/1959
Service Life 53 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1904
GOR Gorton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 13/11/1954
37A Ardsley 5w/e 18/06/1955
   Withdrawn on 06/01/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 21/05/1955
WDN   on 06/01/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1929 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 29
Built at Gorton Works
   
04/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5029    
10/1929 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
17/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7427    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gorton (GOR)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67427    
13/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
18/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
06/01/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67427    

prev prev