Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1026 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18829 Week
» 71845 Month
» 191372 Year
» 3218225 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
457 |
m/e |
01/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5457 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7430 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
67430 |
m/e |
03/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
C13 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 01/1905 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 28/04/1956 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1956 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CHR |
Chester West |
on |
05/01/1947 |
ALLOC |
WRX |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
28/04/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1928 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 457 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
02/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5457 |
|
|
04/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (NTH) |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7430 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Chester Northgate (CHR) |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (WRX) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67430 |
|
|
04/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
28/04/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67430 |
|
|