Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 932 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 932 Week
» 19833 Month
» 19833 Year
» 1685209 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 454 m/e 02/1905
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5454 m/e 07/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7431 m/e 04/1946
British Railways 67431 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C13
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 02/1905
Withdrawal Mon 22/10/1956
Scrapping During 02/1957
Service Life 51 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1905
GOR Gorton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 22/10/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NTH Northwich 9w/e 31/03/1946
WDN   on 22/10/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1928 Superheated boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/09/1947 Stratford Works The following withdrawn locos. were noted in the vicinity of the stripping shop on 25/9: 'F3' 7118/21/29/38/45; 'B12/3' 1522; 'D16/3' 2500; 'J15' 5358 an 5403 (all stripped), whilst 7125 an 7148 were intact. Other locos. stripped were: 'J15' 5402/54; 'D16' 2535; 'J17' 5541/71. In the stripping shop were: 'E4' 2784; 'J15' 5472; 'J19/2' 4675 and 'J17' 5549. In the Paint shop were the 'Coffee Pot' 'Y5' 8081 and W.D. 77416. A curious sight was the crane tank shed filled by two W.D.'s 77119 an 77312 (the latter with a 15A shed plate). In the fields behind the New Works were 'F3' 7146; 'J70' 8225; 'H2' 7512; 'D16' 2591; 'B12' 1544 and 'J39' 4841, all awaiting works. W.D. 77476 was in the New Works, and W.D.'s 77302 and 77107 were in the shed yard. 'D16' 2584; 'J20' 4677/93; 'J39' 4708/61, 'J69' 8574/8632; 'F6' 7230 and 'F4' 7162 were all noted newly painted ex-works. 7162 was fitted with a tablet-catcher. SLS/194711

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1905 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 454
Built at Gorton Works
   
07/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5454    
04/1928 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7431    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gorton (GOR)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67431    
22/10/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 67431    

prev prev