Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 855 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6351 Week
» 25252 Month
» 25252 Year
» 1690628 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 114 m/e 05/1905
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5114 m/e 07/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7437 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 67437 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C13
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 05/1905
Withdrawal Mon 05/08/1957
Scrapping During 08/1957
Service Life 52 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1905
GOR Gorton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 13/11/1954
37A Ardsley 5w/e 18/06/1955
39A Gorton 5w/e 21/01/1956
   Withdrawn on 05/08/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 28/01/1956
WDN   on 05/08/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1931 Superheated boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1949 Darlington Works (scrap yard) New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. SLS/194907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1905 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 114
Built at Gorton Works
   
07/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 5114    
09/1931 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7437    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gorton (GOR)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67437    
13/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
18/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
21/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
05/08/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 67437    

prev prev