Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 505 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6116 Week
» 17162 Month
» 17162 Year
» 1682538 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 115 m/e 07/1905
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5115 m/e 11/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7438 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 67438 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C13
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 07/1905
Withdrawal Mon 13/01/1958
Scrapping During 10/1958
Service Life 52 yrs, 6 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1905
NEA Neasden on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 23/10/1954
56B Ardsley 4w/e 16/03/1957
   Withdrawn on 13/01/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 18/02/1950
ALLOC 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 4w/e 23/03/1957
WDN   on 13/01/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1930 Superheated boiler fitted
07/1941 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order.
Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year.
No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751.
Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420.
SLS/194808

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1905 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 115
Built at Gorton Works
   
11/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5115    
04/1930 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7438    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Neasden (NEA)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67438    
23/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B)    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
13/01/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67438    

prev prev