Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 95 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 95 Week
» 26716 Month
» 26716 Year
» 1692092 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1120 m/e 05/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6120 m/e 01/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7440 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67440 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C14
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Works Number 4926
To Service During 05/1907
Withdrawal Thu 04/07/1957
Scrapping During 08/1957
Service Life 50 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1907
ARD Ardsley on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 5w/e 24/03/1951
37A Ardsley 4w/e 21/07/1951
39A Gorton 4w/e 16/05/1953
   Withdrawn on 04/07/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 37A Ardsley w/e 30/06/1951
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 16/05/1953
WDN   on 04/07/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1929 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1907 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1120
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4926
   
01/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6120    
06/1929 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7440    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67440    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
04/07/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 67440    

prev