Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 35 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 35 Week
» 7647 Month
» 74509 Year
» 1739885 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1121 m/e 05/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6121 m/e 06/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7441 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67441 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C14
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Works Number 4927
To Service During 05/1907
Withdrawal Mon 05/08/1957
Service Life 50 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1957

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1907
ARD   Ardsley on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
39A   Gorton w/e 30/06/1951
39A   Gorton 4w/e 21/07/1951
     Withdrawn on 05/08/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 30/06/1951
WDN   on 05/08/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1926 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1907 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1121
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4927
   
06/1926 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
06/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 6121    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7441    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67441    
30/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
05/08/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 67441    
09/1957 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev