Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 94 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5569 Week
» 5569 Month
» 72431 Year
» 1737807 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1122 m/e 05/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6122 m/e 12/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7442 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67442 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C14
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Works Number 4928
To Service During 05/1907
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/11/1957
Service Life 50 yrs , 7 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1958

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1907
ARD   Ardsley on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
LIN   Lincoln w/e 03/04/1948
WRX   Wrexham Rhosddu w/e 17/07/1948
     Withdrawn w/e 30/11/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln w/e 03/04/1948
ALLOC WRX Wrexham Rhosddu w/e 17/07/1948
WDN   w/e 30/11/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1914 Superheated boiler fitted
11/1923 Saturated Boiler Fitted
03/1932 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1907 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1122
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4928
   
06/1914 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
11/1923 Modification Modification: Saturated Boiler Fitted    
12/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6122    
03/1932 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7442    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD)    
03/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
17/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (WRX)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67442    
30/11/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 67442    
07/1958 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev