Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 87 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 87 Week
» 26708 Month
» 26708 Year
» 1692084 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1123 m/e 05/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6123 m/e 01/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7443 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67443 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C14
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Works Number 4929
To Service During 05/1907
Withdrawal Mon 24/06/1957
Scrapping During 07/1957
Service Life 50 yrs, 1 mth , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1907
ARD Ardsley on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
39A Gorton 5w/e 18/06/1955
   Withdrawn on 24/06/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 21/05/1955
WDN   on 24/06/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1926 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1907 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1123
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4929
   
01/1926 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
01/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 6123    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7443    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67443    
18/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
24/06/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 67443    

prev prev