Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 268 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2537 Week
» 21438 Month
» 21438 Year
» 1686814 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1126 m/e 06/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6126 m/e 07/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7446 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67446 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C14
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Works Number 4932
To Service During 06/1907
Withdrawal Mon 27/05/1957
Scrapping During 06/1957
Service Life 49 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1907
ARD Ardsley on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
39A Gorton 5w/e 18/06/1955
   Withdrawn on 27/05/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 21/05/1955
WDN   on 27/05/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1927 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1907 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1126
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4932
   
07/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6126    
11/1927 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7446    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67446    
18/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
27/05/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 67446    

prev prev