Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 570 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6181 Week
» 17227 Month
» 17227 Year
» 1682603 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1127 m/e 06/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6127 m/e 03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7447 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67447 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C14
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Works Number 4933
To Service During 06/1907
Withdrawal Tue 02/12/1958
Scrapping During 04/1959
Service Life 51 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1907
IPS Ipswich on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
37C Bradford Hammerton Street 3w/e 31/05/1950
39A Gorton 4w/e 21/07/1951
36D Barnsley 4w/e 09/11/1957
   Withdrawn on 02/12/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 37C Bradford Hammerton Street w/e 14/05/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 30/06/1951
ALLOC 36D Barnsley 4w/e 30/11/1957
WDN   on 02/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1930 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1907 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1127
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4933
   
03/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6127    
08/1930 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7447    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67447    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
09/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
02/12/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67447    

prev prev