Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 139 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 3528 Week
» 22429 Month
» 22429 Year
» 1687805 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1128 m/e 06/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6128 m/e 07/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7448 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67448 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C14
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Works Number 4934
To Service During 06/1907
Withdrawal Thu 18/06/1959
Scrapping During 09/1959
Service Life 52 yrs , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1907
IPS Ipswich on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
39A Gorton 4w/e 21/07/1951
36D Barnsley 5w/e 20/07/1957
   Withdrawn on 18/06/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 37C Bradford Hammerton Street w/e 14/05/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 30/06/1951
ALLOC 36D Barnsley 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   on 18/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1928 Superheated boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/04/1959 Branch Lines The following have been approved for closure by the T.U.C.C. and it is expected that some of the passenger services thereon will lapse with the end of Winter t.t.- Kettering to Cambridge (as far as St. Ives), Penistone-Barnsley-Mexborough, South-well branch, Stamford-Essendine, Wallingford branch and Wellingborough-Higham Ferrers; in connection with the Barnsley (C.H.) branch, note that the 1-25 a.m. Manchester (L. Rd.)-Doncaster is still to travel this way calling at Barnsley. The T.U.C.C. have not approved the closure of the Grimsby and Immingham Ty. or the local stations between Sheffield and Penistone; C.I.E. is to close the former G.N.R. (I) Hill of Howth Ty. as from 1st June.
In connection with the quotations which the Press made from the N.U.R. Review of the list of branches 'under consideration' on the L.M.R., it should be noted that the operative word is 'consideration.' Any concrete proposals have to be submitted to the T.U.C.C. concerned, together with the alternative facilities arranged. It is understood that the Churnet Valley, Northampton-Bedford and Bedford-Hitchin branches are to be submitted to the T.U.C.C. for closure together with the local stations between Northampton and Rugby and Roade station. On the W.R., it is understood that it is proposed to withdraw the passenger services from Hartlebury and Kidderminster to Bridgnorth and between Bewdley and Woofferton if the B.T.C. Parliamentary bill is approved.
During the early part of May A5 69808 worked the Southwell branch whilst 58065 was under repair. During May, the Penistone-Barnsley branch was worked by J11s or 67445 (C14); the other C14 (67448) was out of use at Mexborough shed. It is expected that this will be the last sununer that it will be possible to travel by passenger train between Tebay or Penrith and Barnard Castle (goods traffic has already been diverted); the last summer too that it will be possible to travel by steam train on the Oban and Fort William branches. Locomotive Information H.R. 103 is at present in St. Rollox Works undergoing heavy repair. N.B.R. Glen Douglas is in Cowlairs Works being ' restored ' and work on the M.R. Compound proceeds at Derby-on 22nd May the number 1000 was affixed to the smokebox (see Derby Works list).
SLS/195906

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1907 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1128
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4934
   
07/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6128    
07/1928 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7448    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 67448    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
18/06/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 67448    

prev prev