Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1281 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19084 Week
» 72100 Month
» 191627 Year
» 3218480 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
1128 |
m/e |
06/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6128 |
m/e |
07/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7448 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
67448 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
C14 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
4934 |
To Service |
During 06/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 18/06/1959 |
Service Life |
52 yrs , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1928 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/04/1959 |
Branch Lines |
The following have been approved for closure by the T.U.C.C. and it is expected that some of the passenger services thereon will lapse with the end of Winter t.t.- Kettering to Cambridge (as far as St. Ives), Penistone-Barnsley-Mexborough, South-well branch, Stamford-Essendine, Wallingford branch and Wellingborough-Higham Ferrers; in connection with the Barnsley (C.H.) branch, note that the 1-25 a.m. Manchester (L. Rd.)-Doncaster is still to travel this way calling at Barnsley. The T.U.C.C. have not approved the closure of the Grimsby and Immingham Ty. or the local stations between Sheffield and Penistone; C.I.E. is to close the former G.N.R. (I) Hill of Howth Ty. as from 1st June. In connection with the quotations which the Press made from the N.U.R. Review of the list of branches 'under consideration' on the L.M.R., it should be noted that the operative word is 'consideration.' Any concrete proposals have to be submitted to the T.U.C.C. concerned, together with the alternative facilities arranged. It is understood that the Churnet Valley, Northampton-Bedford and Bedford-Hitchin branches are to be submitted to the T.U.C.C. for closure together with the local stations between Northampton and Rugby and Roade station. On the W.R., it is understood that it is proposed to withdraw the passenger services from Hartlebury and Kidderminster to Bridgnorth and between Bewdley and Woofferton if the B.T.C. Parliamentary bill is approved. During the early part of May A5 69808 worked the Southwell branch whilst 58065 was under repair. During May, the Penistone-Barnsley branch was worked by J11s or 67445 (C14); the other C14 (67448) was out of use at Mexborough shed. It is expected that this will be the last sununer that it will be possible to travel by passenger train between Tebay or Penrith and Barnard Castle (goods traffic has already been diverted); the last summer too that it will be possible to travel by steam train on the Oban and Fort William branches. Locomotive Information H.R. 103 is at present in St. Rollox Works undergoing heavy repair. N.B.R. Glen Douglas is in Cowlairs Works being ' restored ' and work on the M.R. Compound proceeds at Derby-on 22nd May the number 1000 was affixed to the smokebox (see Derby Works list). |
SLS/195906 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 1128 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4934 |
|
|
07/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6128 |
|
|
07/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7448 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
14/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67448 |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) |
|
|
18/06/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67448 |
|
|
09/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|