Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 1061 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 2233 Week
» 21134 Month
» 21134 Year
» 1686510 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1129 m/e 06/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6129 m/e 07/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7449 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 67449 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class C14
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Works Number 4935
To Service During 06/1907
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/12/1957
Scrapping During 07/1958
Service Life 50 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1907
ARD Ardsley on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn w/e 07/12/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln w/e 27/03/1948
ALLOC WRX Wrexham Rhosddu w/e 17/07/1948
WDN   w/e 07/12/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1930 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1907 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1129
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4935
   
07/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6129    
06/1930 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7449    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67449    
07/12/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 67449    

prev prev