Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1284 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19087 Week
» 72103 Month
» 191630 Year
» 3218483 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
57 |
m/e |
05/1911 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2208 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
62208 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
D1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
265 |
Works Number |
1302 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 13/07/1950 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1911 |
HAW |
|
Hawick |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
13/07/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
64G |
Hawick |
on |
13/07/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1926 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1926 |
Westinghouse Brake fitted |
01/1944 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
01/1944 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1945 |
Leeds Area |
Latest B.16/3 843 appeared on 2.5.p.m. Darlington-Leeds turn on 20/9. B.17 2826 was noted on 3/10 working north on a Class A Goods on the main line near Thirsk. N.13 2405 and J.21 1593 proceeded north through Ripon on 5/10 coupled together (1593 'dead') apparently going to works. The chief effect of the new timetables seems to have been a reduction in the loading of long distance passenger trains. The 9.20 a.m. Newcastle-Liverpool E.P. during the first eleven days of the new timetable consisted of 14-16 bogies, compared with 15-18 previously. It has now been cut to 12 daily and the train is still double-headed from Ripon to Leeds. During the summer the relief to this train usually was made up of 12-14 bogies, and was always worked by one engine! Ex-N.E. Z have been much in evidence on Neville Hill turns lately. Since 4/10 the following combinations have been noted on the 9.20 Newcastle-Liverpool: 2204 & 4866; 2193, 2206 an 722 all piloting 2568 on different days; 2208 & 3648; and 729 & 211 on the 9.0 Liverpool-Newcastle: On 12/10 the relief 9.20 Newcastle-Liverpool was worked by K.2 4651 with 10 bogies, and piloted from Ripon by A.6 688 bunker first. D.21 1245 which was awaiting works at the Darlington shed visit in July, has reappeared, and was first noted on 8/10, piloting D.20 1210 on the 9.40 a.m. Leeds to Middlesbrough (a regular double-headed working). |
SLS/194601 |
31/07/1950 |
Cowlairs Works |
Engines due into Works, July 1950: 61754/71, 1931, 61983, 62208, 62424, 4549/61, 67605/67, 68324, 8450, 69187, 69219, 77230, 90262, 90498. |
SLS/195010 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 57 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1302 |
|
|
02/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
02/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted |
|
|
01/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2208 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hawick (HAW) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62208 |
|
|
13/07/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62208 |
|
|