Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2695 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16101 Week
» 69117 Month
» 188644 Year
» 3215497 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
64 |
m/e |
07/1911 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2215 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
62215 |
m/e |
03/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
D1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
265 |
Works Number |
1309 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 07/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 10/02/1950 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1911 |
PTH |
|
Perth (LNER) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
63A |
|
|
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/02/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
63A |
|
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
WDN |
63A |
Perth South |
on |
10/02/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1927 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
01/1927 |
Westinghouse Brake fitted |
11/1943 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
11/1943 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1950 |
Cowlairs Works |
Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 61002/64, 61350, 61742/43/57/58, 1760, 61792, 61851, 61996/98, 62215, 2431/89, 62719, 4556, 64589, 4597/99, 64613, 4922, 5903, 65926, 67455, 67605, 8956, 69139, 69203/08, 69500/96, ex-W.D. 73789. 90755/66. |
SLS/195004 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 64 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1309 |
|
|
01/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
01/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted |
|
|
11/1943 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1943 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2215 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Perth (LNER) (PTH) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62215 |
|
|
24/09/1949 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
10/02/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62215 |
|
|