Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 622 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7305 Week
» 18351 Month
» 18351 Year
» 1683727 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 696 m/e 10/1895
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5696 m/e 06/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Pollitt
Class D5
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D510/1895
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service During 10/1895 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal During 07/1930 off Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)
Service Life 34 yrs , 9 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) m/e 10/1895
SHF Sheffield Neepsend by 1910
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) by 1921
WAL   by 1925
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) m/e 02/1928
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1930

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN YK York (North) on 09/11/1946
ALLOC AUK West Auckland on 09/03/1947
ALLOC SKN Stockton on 25/01/1948
ALLOC AUK West Auckland w/e 14/02/1948
ALLOC 51A Darlington on 30/07/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1895 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 696
Built at Gorton Works
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
   
1910 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
1921 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5696    
1925 Allocation      
02/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
07/1930 Withdrawn Condemned as 5696 from Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    

prev prev