Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 971 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6582 Week
» 17628 Month
» 17628 Year
» 1683004 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1018 m/e 02/1902
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6018 m/e 01/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2305 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 62305 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class D9
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D902/1902
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
Order Number E1182b
Works Number 4828
To Service During 02/1902
Withdrawal w/e Mon 24/07/1950
Scrapping During 10/1950
Service Life 48 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1902
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn w/e 24/07/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC MAR March m/e 28/02/1946
ALLOC TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 10/08/1947
WDN   w/e 24/07/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1919 Rebuilt with Piston Valves
08/1919 Superheated boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1950 Great Central classes Some of the Great Central classes are now becoming extinct: class 'B.5' No. 1686 withdrawn on 12/6 was the last to remain in traffic; built in 1904 (Beyer Peacock No. 4534) it belonged to G.C. 'Class 8' which were termed the 'Fish Engines,' with outside cylinders 19' x 26' and 6' 1' coupled wheels: originally No. 183, it was subsequently allotted L.N.E. Nos. 5183, 1308. and 1686 and B.R. 61686-but none of the class were renumbered in the 6XXXX. Another class which has become extinct is 'B.7,' once known as the 'Baby Faringdons' (G.C. class '9Q') with four cylinders 16' x 26' and 5' 8' coupled wheels: No. 61711, withdrawn 3/7/50, was built at Gorton in October 1923 as L.N.E. No. 478C (later 5478), renumbered 1391 on 25/11/46. 61391 on 29/1/49 and 61711 on 30/4/49. The withdrawal of 62307 Queen Mary on 12/6/50 left only one of the 'D.9' class in service (No. 62305, originally G.C. No. 1018, built in 1902). Later. No. 62305 was withdrawn 24/7/50. SLS/195008
24/07/1950 Last D.6 It will be seen that the last of the D.6, on loan to the L.M.R. has been condemned (62305, 24/7). SLS/195010

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1902 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1018
Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4828
   
08/1919 Modification Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves    
08/1919 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
01/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 6018    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2305    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62305    
24/07/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 62305    

prev prev