Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 499 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6110 Week
» 17156 Month
» 17156 Year
» 1682532 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1026 m/e 03/1902
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6026 m/e 01/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2311 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 62311 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class D9
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D903/1902
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
Order Number E1182b
Works Number 4836
To Service During 03/1902
Withdrawal Mon 18/07/1949 off To London Midland Region (91M)
Scrapping During 09/1949
Service Life 47 yrs, 4 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1902
WAL Walton on the Hill on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 18/07/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIV Brunswick m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC WAL Walton on the Hill on 13/04/1947
WDN 91M To London Midland Region on 18/07/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1909 Rebuilt with Piston Valves
10/1914 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1902 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1026
Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4836
   
12/1909 Modification Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves    
10/1914 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
01/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6026    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2311    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Walton on the Hill (WAL)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62311    
18/07/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 62311 from To London Midland Region (91M)    

prev prev