Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 362 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5973 Week
» 17019 Month
» 17019 Year
» 1682395 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1038 m/e 03/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6038 m/e 12/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2322 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 62322 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class D9
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D903/1903
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Sharp Stewart
Order Number E1198
Works Number 4964
To Service During 03/1903
Withdrawal During 01/1949
Scrapping During 01/1949
Service Life 45 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1903
STP Heaton Mersey on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 10/08/1947
ALLOC STP Heaton Mersey w/e 29/11/1947
WDN STPLMR   on 12/01/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1914 Rebuilt with Piston Valves
10/1914 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1903 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1038
Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4964
   
10/1914 Modification Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves    
10/1914 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
12/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6038    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2322    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Heaton Mersey (STP)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 62322 but not taken up    
01/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 2322    

prev prev