Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 317 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5928 Week
» 16974 Month
» 16974 Year
» 1682350 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 507 m/e 02/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5507 m/e 03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2661 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 62661 m/e 12/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
02/1920 GERARD POWYS DEWHURST

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 02/1920
Withdrawal Fri 18/11/1960
Scrapping During 12/1960
Service Life 40 yrs, 9 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1920
IMM Immingham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 24/02/1951
9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 19/05/1951
9G Northwich 4w/e 26/03/1955
41A Sheffield Darnall 5w/e 14/06/1958
41H Staveley (G.C.) w/e 13/06/1959
   Withdrawn on 18/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham on 14/07/1947
LOAN 9E Trafford Park (LMS) m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 07/04/1951
ALLOC 9G Northwich 4w/e 26/03/1955
LOAN 41A Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 13/06/1959
WDN   on 18/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1944 Long Travel Valves fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/11/1945 Swindon Station On 4/11 the L.N.E.R. working from Sheffield was K3 17. The engine remained in Swindon and has since entered Works with a hot box on one of the trailing coupled wheels. G.W. Castle 4083 worked back on the L.N.E.R. turn though presumably only, as far as Banbury. On 11/11 5507 was noted; otherwise the workings have been in the hands of B17 locomotives for the last few months. SLS/194601
09/08/1958 DarnallMPD Dll 62662 Prince of Wales is ex-works fully lined out and kept smart in contrast to the other D1 ls (62660/1/4-70) at this shed. All the D11s in the south are now on the GC section; in addition to Sheffield -Nottingham locals (a Staveley one even works to Leicester) they also work locals to Lincoln. SLS/195809
02/05/1959 Staveley MPD (41H) ex GCR 62665 has gone from store to Gorton Works for overhaul; 62663 is back at work on the GC line (Sheffield-Nottingham-Leicester). D11s still stored on 2nd May are 62660/1/6/9. Three diesel shunters from 41A shunt in the yards here. SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1920 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 507, name: GERARD POWYS DEWHURST
Built at Gorton Works
   
03/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5507    
06/1944 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2661    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62661    
24/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (9G)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
13/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
18/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 62661    

prev prev